NM HB47 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Locomotive fuel gross receipts
Title
Locomotive fuel gross receipts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Passed House (65-2) | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do not pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] House Pre-file |