NM HB46 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Sentencing For Certain Felonies
Title
Sentencing For Certain Felonies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (66-0) |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Safety & Civil Affairs |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Safety & Civil Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Printed |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |