NM HB441 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lottery Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2019-03-04HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-03-01HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-22HouseReferred to: HTRC
2019-02-22HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2019-02-20HouseHSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-31HouseSent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback