NM HB436 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 259 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 259 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Align Health Insurance Law With Federal Law
Title
Align Health Insurance Law With Federal Law
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Armstrong [D] | Rep. Micaela Cadena [D] | Rep. William Pratt [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Thomson [D] |
Rep. Christine Trujillo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 259 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-15 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:21 N:14 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:40 N:24 |
2019-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-03-03 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-18 | House | Sent to committee - Referrals: HSEIC |
2019-02-18 | House | HJC ref w/drn |
2019-02-18 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HSEIC/HJC |