NM HB43 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Safety Employee Contribution Payments
Title
Public Safety Employee Contribution Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 39 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (66-0) |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Printed |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |