NM HB429 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Compensating tax transaction requirements
Title
Compensating tax transaction requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Lujan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.175. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] SFC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] fl/a- PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2011-02-25 | [LD 39] w/o rec | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP-HTRC | |
2011-02-04 | [LD 18] HBIC/HTRC-HBIC |