NM HB423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Passed Senate (41-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Passed Senate (41-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Infrastructure Development Zone Meetings
Title
Infrastructure Development Zone Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (41-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (62-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HLELC |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HLELC and then to House Consumer & Public Affairs |