NM HB412 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-11 - [LD 26] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
Pending: Senate Corporations & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-11 - [LD 26] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
Pending: Senate Corporations & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Reform
Title
Tax Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (63-0) |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] fl and then to sub adptd |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |