NM HB392 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (23-17) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (23-17) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public education commission as independent
Title
Public education commission as independent
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (23-17) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Education |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (37-27) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Referred to House Education |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Voters & Elections |
2013-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Assigned to House Voters & Elections and then to House Education |