NM HB370 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Overdose Education
Title
Opioid Overdose Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-18 | House | [LD 33] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 59 |
2017-02-18 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (61-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] HHouse Health |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HSIVC |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HSIVC and then to HHouse Health |