NM HB35 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Additional funding units for some schools
Title
Additional funding units for some schools
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 57. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Education |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Education |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |