NM HB347 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 88.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 88.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Trust company certificate fees
Title
Trust company certificate fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 88. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (53-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | [LD 25] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-18 | House | [LD 25] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2013-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |