NM HB340 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Change certain voter id requirements
Title
Change certain voter id requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (37-29) |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] HGEIC |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary |