NM HB333 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cyfd custody of abused children
Title
Cyfd custody of abused children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (52-11) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Assigned to House Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Printed |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Not Printed |