NM HB33 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-01 - [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
Pending: Senate Public Affairs Committee
Hearing: Feb 28 in Room 321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deferred Compensation Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deferred Compensation Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-01Senate[LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2017-02-01Senate[LD 16] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Passed House (68-0)
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-20House[LD 4] HSIVC
2017-01-20House[LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-17House[LD 1] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs
2017-01-17House[LD 1] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to HSIVC
2017-01-17House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback