NM HB33 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Approval Of Certain Projects By Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approval Of Certain Projects By Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-18 - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-10House[LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 38
2016-02-10Senate[LD 23] Passed Senate (35-3)
2016-02-05Senate[LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted
2016-02-04Senate[LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance
2016-02-04Senate[LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted
2016-01-30Senate[LD 12] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2016-01-30Senate[LD 12] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance
2016-01-26House[LD 8] Passed House (60-0)
2016-01-24House[LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted
2016-01-22House[LD 4] Referred to House Ways & Means
2016-01-22House[LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted
2016-01-20House[LD 2] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs
2016-01-20House[LD 2] Assigned to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and then to House Ways & Means
2016-01-20House[LD 2] Assigned to
2016-01-20House[LD 2] Printed
2016-01-20House[LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2016-01-19House[LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business
2016-01-19House[LD 1] Not Printed
2016-01-19House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback