NM HB324 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 118 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 118 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ptsd As Firefighter Employment Condition
Title
Ptsd As Firefighter Employment Condition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 118 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:5 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:4 |
2019-02-26 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-13 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HLVMC |