NM HB320 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner associations limits on flags
Title
Homeowner associations limits on flags
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | [LD 48] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.104. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Passed House (59-3) |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-04 | House | [LD 12] HGEIC |
2015-02-04 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to HGEIC |