NM HB315 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (33-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 71.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (33-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 71.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use of winegrower facilities
Title
Use of winegrower facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (33-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 71. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP-SCONC | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] SCORC/SCONC-SCORC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/H (64-0) | |
2011-02-25 | [LD 39] DP | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP/a-HJC | |
2011-01-28 | [LD 11] HBIC/HJC-HBIC |