NM HB312 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 32 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 32 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create Environmental Health Fund
Title
Create Environmental Health Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 32 - Mar. 4 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0 |
2020-02-08 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to: HAFC |
2020-01-31 | House | Printed |
2020-01-31 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2020-01-30 | House | Not Printed |