NM HB310 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Acceptable Uses Of Campaign Funds
Title
Acceptable Uses Of Campaign Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Passed House (66-0) |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Printed |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Not Printed |