NM HB31 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water trust fund investment standard of care
Title
Water trust fund investment standard of care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP API. | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SFC | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] SCONC/SFC-SCONC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] PASSED/H (66-0) | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP | |
2011-01-26 | [LD 9] DP-HAFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HAGC/HAFC-HAGC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=31&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0031.pdf |