NM HB301 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-07 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-07 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Archive Legislative Webcasts
Title
Archive Legislative Webcasts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Passed House (61-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Printed |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Not Printed |