NM HB30 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 34.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 34.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative fuel tax definitions & payment
Title
Alternative fuel tax definitions & payment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 34. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (57-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |