NM HB296 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Convictions In Certain Courts As "adults"
Title
Convictions In Certain Courts As "adults"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 31 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (51-17) |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Judiciary |