NM HB285 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - [LD 24] Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - [LD 24] Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Magistrate & Metro Court Warrant Fees
Title
Magistrate & Metro Court Warrant Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Daymon Ely [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (47-20) |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |