NM HB280 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Investments for local govt. permanent funds
Title
Investments for local govt. permanent funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] SFC API. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (62-0) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP-HBIC | |
2011-01-27 | [LD 10] HHGAC/HBIC-HHGAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=280&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0280.pdf |