NM HB28 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - [LD 31] Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Driver's License Automatic Voter Registration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's License Automatic Voter Registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16Senate[LD 31] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2017-02-16Senate[LD 31] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted and then to a
2017-02-08Senate[LD 23] Referred to Senate Rules
2017-02-08Senate[LD 23] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary
2017-01-26House[LD 10] Passed House (56-10)
2017-01-25House[LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-01-20House[LD 4] HLELC
2017-01-20House[LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-17House[LD 1] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs
2017-01-17House[LD 1] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to HLELC
2017-01-17House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback