NM HB28 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - [LD 35] DP-SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - [LD 35] DP-SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Statute of limitations for certain sex crimes
Title
Statute of limitations for certain sex crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SJC API. | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] SPAC/SJC/SFC-SPAC | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DNP-CS/DP | |
2011-01-26 | [LD 9] DP-HJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |