NM HB276 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crime Of Targeted Residential Picketing
Title
Crime Of Targeted Residential Picketing
Sponsors
Rep. Daymon Ely [D] | Rep. Jason Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:33 N:31 |
2021-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-03-09 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-22 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-11 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |