NM HB263 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed Senate (38-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 64.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Geothermal renewable energy certificates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Geothermal renewable energy certificates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-18 - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-17Senate[LD 41] Passed Senate (38-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 64.
2015-03-16Senate[LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-03-05Senate[LD 33] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2015-03-05Senate[LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-02-09Senate[LD 15] Referred to Senate Conservation
2015-02-09Senate[LD 15] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2015-02-09House[LD 15] Passed House (55-0)
2015-02-04House[LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-01-29House[LD 8] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs
2015-01-29House[LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-23House[LD 4] HEENC
2015-01-23House[LD 4] HEENC and then to HRPAC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback