NM HB26 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (38-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (38-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical-assistance home program osteopathy
Title
Medical-assistance home program osteopathy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (38-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.43. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP-SCORC | |
2010-01-29 | [LD 9] SPAC/SCORC-SPAC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (62-0) | |
2010-02-03 | [LD 12] DP | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] DP/a-HHGAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HCPAC/HHGAC-HCPAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |