NM HB257 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighter & Emergency Provider Peer Support
Title
Firefighter & Emergency Provider Peer Support
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2023-03-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:2 |
2023-02-28 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-02-17 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-01-31 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HAFC |