NM HB250 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Money Services Act
Title
Uniform Money Services Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 88 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (61-0) |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Business & Employment |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Business & Employment and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Printed |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Not Printed |