NM HB249 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher & school leader effectiveness act
Title
Teacher & school leader effectiveness act
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Roch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Passed House (57-9) | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Do not pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-06 | [LD 15] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources | |
2012-02-06 | [LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-06 | [LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-26 | [LD 8] Referred to House Education | |
2012-01-26 | [LD 8] Assigned to House Education and then to House Labor & Human Resources |