NM HB229 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utility Facility Property Tax Valuation
Title
Utility Facility Property Tax Valuation
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (68-0) |
2016-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Ways & Means |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Printed |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |