NM HB228 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-18 - [LD 33] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Right To Try Act
Title
Health Care Right To Try Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-18 | Senate | [LD 33] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (62-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-19 | House | [LD 3] HHouse Health |
2017-01-19 | House | [LD 3] HHouse Health and then to House Judiciary |