NM HB225 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 8 - Feb.26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Kiki Saavedra Senior Dignity Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kiki Saavedra Senior Dignity Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 8 - Feb.26
2020-02-19HouseHouse has concurred with Senate Amendments
2020-02-17SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0
2020-02-15SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-13SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2020-02-12HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0
2020-02-08HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-03HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-24HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HAFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback