NM HB223 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC
Pending: Senate Taxation, Business and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC
Pending: Senate Taxation, Business and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nontraditional Comm Or Disability Registry
Title
Nontraditional Comm Or Disability Registry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:54 N:12 |
2021-03-09 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-19 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-02 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HJC |