NM HB22 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 11 - Mar. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 11 - Mar. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grow Your Own Teachers Act Scholarships
Title
Grow Your Own Teachers Act Scholarships
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Figueroa [D] | Rep. Joy Garratt [D] | Rep. Raymundo Lara [D] | Sen. Michael Padilla [D] |
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 11 - Mar. 18 |
2021-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-01 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SHPAC |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:69 N:0 |
2021-02-16 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-04 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HSEIC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |