NM HB218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Equine Facility Purchase Of Certain Horses
Title
Equine Facility Purchase Of Certain Horses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:2 |
2019-02-25 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-05 | House | HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HSEIC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |