NM HB215 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 76.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 76.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education trust board changes
Title
Education trust board changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 76. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (64-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Education |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Printed |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Not Printed |