NM HB21 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 16 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit Nda For Sexual Harassment Cases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit Nda For Sexual Harassment Cases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 16 - Mar. 4
2020-02-20SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:23 N:13
2020-02-19SenateSJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-14SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
2020-02-13HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
2020-02-11HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-05HouseHLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-22HouseSent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HJC
2020-01-21HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback