NM HB207 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 29 - Mar. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 29 - Mar. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expand Human Rights Act Scope
Title
Expand Human Rights Act Scope
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 29 - Mar. 24 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:26 N:10 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-07 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-04 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:47 N:20 |
2023-02-25 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-02-13 | House | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-26 | House | Sent to HGEIC - Referrals: HGEIC/HJC |