NM HB207 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - [LD 32] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - [LD 32] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native american veterans division
Title
Native american veterans division
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Jeff [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Assigned to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs and then to Senate Rules and then to Senate Finance |
2013-02-19 | House | [LD 26] Passed House (62-0) |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |