NM HB202 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hunting & fishing infraction penalties
Title
Hunting & fishing infraction penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 27. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Passed House (57-3) |
2015-02-10 | House | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] HAWC |
2015-02-02 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to HAWC |