NM HB201 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-10 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-10 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make Angel Investment Credit Refundable
Title
Make Angel Investment Credit Refundable
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (60-2) |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] HLEDC |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] HLEDC and then to House Taxation & Revenue |