NM HB201 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Add species to game fish
Title
Add species to game fish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 26. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-06 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (62-1) |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HAWC |