NM HB201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting home school program units
Title
Adjusting home school program units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP API. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] SEC | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/H (50-18) | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP/a-HEC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] HCPAC/HEC-HCPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=201&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0201.pdf |