NM HB2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Appropriation Act Of 2019
Title
General Appropriation Act Of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-15 | House | Senate Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | House Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent to CC |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate failed to recede from its amendments |
2019-03-13 | House | House has failed to concur in Senate Amendments on a House Bill |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:2 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:46 N:23 |
2019-02-18 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |